Texas – Hockley – Levelland
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Hockley
Levelland
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
23797
1982
FDIC Certificate Number: 23797
FDIC's unique number: 16634
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock
Federal Reserve ID Number: 941859
Report Date: 1999-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-02-11
1982-04-19 Institution established. Original name: South Plains National Bank.
1991-11-15 Changed name to South Plains Bank .
1991-11-15 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1999-12-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of City Bank in Lubbock, Texas.
2000-12-06 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2001-01-01 Acquired West Texas Trust Company in Levelland, Texas.
2001-06-29 Acquired The Farmers National Bank Of Forney in Forney, Texas.
Total assets: $52,454,000
Total deposits: $48,520,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
South Plains Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with South Plains Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and South Plains Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27126