Missouri – St. Louis (city) – Saint Louis
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Missouri
St. Louis (city)
Saint Louis
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
14322
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 14322
FDIC's unique number: 8948
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 192352
Report Date: 2001-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14128
The date of the last data update: 2001-11-09
1934-05-01 Institution established. Original name: South Side National Bank In St. Louis.
1990-06-28 Acquired St. Louis County Savings Association, F.A. in Ferguson, Missouri.
1998-06-29 Acquired Public Service Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in St. Louis, Missouri.
2001-10-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Allegiant Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2002-04-09 Moved bank headquarters from St. Louis, Missouri to Saint Louis, Missouri.
2002-05-10 Acquired The Bank Of St. Charles County in St. Charles, Missouri.
2002-10-25 Acquired State Bank Of Jefferson County in De Soto, Missouri.
2004-07-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank of the Midwest in Bannockburn, Illinois.
2006-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2006-08-19 Acquired Pioneer Bank And Trust Company in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2007-03-17 Acquired Harbor Federal Savings Bank in Fort Pierce, Florida.
2007-04-14 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank & Trust in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2008-02-09 Acquired Midamerica Bank, Fsb in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
Total assets: $552,264,000
Total deposits: $388,708,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
South Side National Bank in St. Louis does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with South Side National Bank in St. Louis, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and South Side National Bank in St. Louis will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21123