Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
29724
1936
FDIC Certificate Number: 29724
FDIC's unique number: 42558
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 532677
Report Date: 1992-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1992-12-14
1936-06-01 Institution established. Original name: Southern Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Georgia.
1986-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1992-07-10 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Southern Federal Savings Association of Georgia in Atlanta, Georgia.
1994-04-22 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Trust Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
1998-01-30 Acquired First Southern Bank in Lithonia, Georgia.
2000-03-13 Acquired Mutual Federal Savings Bank in Atlanta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2003-03-01 Acquired Citizens Federal Savings Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
Total assets: $159,982,000
Total deposits: $151,424,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Southern Federal Savings and Loan Association of Georgia does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Southern Federal Savings and Loan Association of Georgia, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southern Federal Savings and Loan Association of Georgia will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14280