Hawaii – Honolulu – Honolulu
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Hawaii
Honolulu
Honolulu
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
24810
1945
FDIC Certificate Number: 24810
FDIC's unique number: 17208
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)
Federal Reserve ID Number: 529163
Report Date: 2000-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-07-11
1945-04-26 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Standard Finance Company, Limited.
1983-11-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from State to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1983-11-21 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1983-11-21 Became FDIC insured.
1983-11-21 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1988-02-17 Changed name to Standard Financial Corp. .
2000-04-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Hawaiian Bank in Honolulu, Hawaii.
2004-03-08 Reorganized.
2004-04-30 Reorganized.
Total assets: $21,465,000
Total deposits: $17,861,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Standard Financial Corp. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Standard Financial Corp., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Standard Financial Corp. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4522