Missouri – Jackson – Independence
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Missouri
Jackson
Independence
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
1646
1921
FDIC Certificate Number: 1646
FDIC's unique number: 1082
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 700355
Report Date: 1991-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-12-18
1921-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Standard State Bank.
1988-04-18 Changed name to Standard State Bank And Trust .
1991-12-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Standard Bank and Trust in Independence, Missouri.
1995-01-27 Changed name to Bank Iv Missouri, National Association .
1995-01-27 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1995-08-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank IV, National Association in Wichita, Kansas.
1995-08-18 Moved bank headquarters from Independence, Missouri to Overland Park, Kansas.
1996-10-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Boatmen's National Bank in Kansas City, Missouri.
1997-03-14 Changed name to Nationsbank, National Association .
1997-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southern Missouri in Springfield, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Oklahoma in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of Albuquerque, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of South Arkansas in Camden, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Newark in Newark, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Kansas in Prairie Village, Kansas.
1998-01-15 Acquired Sun World, National Association in Santa Teresa, New Mexico.
1998-01-23 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Illinois in Belleville, Illinois.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company, An Oklahoma Trust Company in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1998-03-28 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-05-06 Acquired Nationsbank Of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Total assets: $75,634,000
Total deposits: $68,836,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Standard State Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Standard State Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Standard State Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15285