Nebraska – Thayer – Alexandria
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Nebraska
Thayer
Alexandria
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17466
1884
FDIC Certificate Number: 17466
FDIC's unique number: 11454
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Grand Island
Federal Reserve ID Number: 394950
Report Date: 1985-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1884-01-01 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Alexandria.
1985-04-10 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
Total assets: $2,545,000
Total deposits: $2,413,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
State Bank of Alexandria does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with State Bank of Alexandria, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank of Alexandria will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25504