New York – Madison – Chittenango
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.oneidabank.com
New York
Madison
Chittenango
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
12940
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 12940
FDIC's unique number: 8185
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Syracuse
Federal Reserve ID Number: 103602
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-10-16
1923-02-23 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Chittenango.
2007-04-02 Acquired The National Bank Of Vernon in Vernon, New York.
Total assets: $153,587,000
Total deposits: $127,199,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $127,199,000
Equity capital: $11,777,000
Net income: $1,238,000
Return on Assets: 1.63
Return on Equity: 25
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No associations
LandOfFree
State Bank of Chittenango does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with State Bank of Chittenango, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank of Chittenango will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18910