Iowa – Shelby – Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Iowa
Shelby
Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12419
1887
FDIC Certificate Number: 12419
FDIC's unique number: 7903
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Omaha
Federal Reserve ID Number: 526144
Report Date: 1986-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1887-01-01 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Portsmouth.
1986-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Shelby County State Bank in Harlan, Iowa.
1992-01-17 Acquired Farmers Savings Bank in Irwin, Iowa.
1994-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Shelby County State Bank in Harlan, Iowa.
Total assets: $22,459,000
Total deposits: $19,909,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
State Bank of Portsmouth does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with State Bank of Portsmouth, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank of Portsmouth will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18013