State Bank & Trust Company

Mississippi – Leflore – Greenwood

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

8878

1898

FDIC Certificate Number: 8878
FDIC's unique number: 5670
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms

Federal Reserve ID Number: 736448
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 37
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-07-17

1898-11-01 Institution established. Original name: The Valley Bank.
1986-03-21 Moved bank headquarters from Rosedale, Mississippi to Cleveland, Mississippi.
1995-12-05 Acquired Bank Of Webb in Webb, Mississippi.
2000-07-31 Acquired State Bank & Trust Company in Brookhaven, Mississippi.
2000-07-31 Changed name to State Bank & Trust Company .
2002-12-06 Acquired Mississippi Southern Bank in Port Gibson, Mississippi.
2003-11-14 Moved bank headquarters from Cleveland, Mississippi to Greenwood, Mississippi.
2005-04-01 Acquired First Bank in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
2006-06-01 Acquired Consumer National Bank in Jackson, Mississippi.
2007-07-01 Acquired The American Bank in Geneva, Alabama.

Total assets: $907,799,000
Total deposits: $725,984,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $725,984,000
Equity capital: $111,552,000

Net income: $2,271,000

Return on Assets: 0.5
Return on Equity: 4.13
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: State Bank & Trust Company Employee Stock Ownership Plan

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

State Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with State Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24072

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.