Indiana – Wabash – Roann
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Indiana
Wabash
Roann
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
13120
1882
FDIC Certificate Number: 13120
FDIC's unique number: 8301
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 914947
Report Date: 1984-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1882-01-01 Institution established. Original name: State Exchange Bank.
1984-08-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Lake City Bank in Warsaw, Indiana.
1995-07-15 Acquired Gateway Bank in Lagrange, Indiana.
2003-12-01 Reorganized.
2006-04-18 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2006-04-18 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $19,619,000
Total deposits: $18,611,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
State Exchange Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with State Exchange Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Exchange Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24990