Oregon – Benton – Corvallis
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Oregon
Benton
Corvallis
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31354
1962
FDIC Certificate Number: 31354
FDIC's unique number: 44188
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Portland
Federal Reserve ID Number: 400477
Report Date: 1985-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10
1962-12-21 Institution established. Original name: State Savings And Loan Association.
1980-11-30 Acquired Community First Savings And Loan Association in Coos Bay, Oregon.
1984-02-29 Changed name to State Federal Savings And Loan Association .
1985-12-06 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1986-01-01 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Freedom Federal Savings and Loan Association in Corvallis, Oregon.
1986-02-28 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings & Loan.
1988-01-29 Acquired Citizens Savings And Loan Association, A Federal Savings And Loan Associ in Salem, Oregon as part of a government assisted transaction.
1988-09-16 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Washington Federal Savings and Loan Association in Seattle, Washington.
1991-09-03 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Idaho Falls, Idaho.
1993-03-12 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1996-11-30 Acquired Metropolitan Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Seattle in Seattle, Washington.
2003-08-31 Acquired United Savings And Loan Bank in Seattle, Washington.
2007-02-13 Acquired First Federal Bank in Roswell, New Mexico.
2008-02-01 Acquired First Mutual Bank in Bellevue, Washington.
2010-01-08 Acquired Horizon Bank in Bellingham, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-07 Changed name to Washington Federal .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $563,862,000
Total deposits: $443,856,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
State Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with State Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25842