New Jersey – Somerset – Hillsborough
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Jersey
Somerset
Hillsborough
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
27157
1988
FDIC Certificate Number: 27157
FDIC's unique number: 38989
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1163331
Report Date: 1991-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21471
The date of the last data update: 1992-04-09
1988-01-13 Institution established. Original name: Suburban National Bank.
1991-07-26 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Provident Bank in Jersey City, New Jersey.
1998-12-23 Acquired Monarch Bank, Fsb in Kearny, New Jersey.
2000-12-11 Changed name to The Provident Bank .
2004-07-14 Acquired First Savings Bank in Woodbridge, New Jersey.
2007-04-01 Acquired First Morris Bank And Trust in Morris Township, New Jersey.
Total assets: $91,091,000
Total deposits: $91,287,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Suburban National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Suburban National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Suburban National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22725