Indiana – Noble – Kendallville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Indiana
Noble
Kendallville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
18614
1962
FDIC Certificate Number: 18614
FDIC's unique number: 12499
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 149244
Report Date: 1988-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1962-10-25 Institution established. Original name: Kendallville Bank & Trust Co.
1986-09-02 Reorganized.
1987-01-02 Changed name to Summit Bank Of Kendallville .
1988-06-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Summit Bank in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
1991-12-13 Acquired Summit Bank Of South Bend in South Bend, Indiana.
1993-04-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NBD Bank, National Association in Gary, Indiana.
1993-06-18 Acquired Inb Banking Company, North in Chesterton, Indiana.
1993-06-18 Acquired Inb National Bank, Northwest in Lafayette, Indiana.
1993-07-23 Acquired Inb Banking Company, Northeast in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
1993-08-13 Acquired Inb Banking Company Southwest in Evansville, Indiana.
1993-09-10 Acquired Inb Banking Company in Jeffersonville, Indiana.
1993-10-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NBD Bank, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
1999-06-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2002-08-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $53,958,000
Total deposits: $48,402,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Summit Bank of Kendallville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Summit Bank of Kendallville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Summit Bank of Kendallville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11768