Texas – Hockley – Sundown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.sundownsb.com
Texas
Hockley
Sundown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
18780
1963
FDIC Certificate Number: 18780
FDIC's unique number: 12641
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock
Federal Reserve ID Number: 412667
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1963-05-21 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Sundown.
1972-01-03 Changed name to Sundown State Bank .
1972-01-03 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
Total assets: $117,508,000
Total deposits: $107,537,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $107,537,000
Equity capital: $9,778,000
Net income: $637,000
Return on Assets: 1.15
Return on Equity: 13.52
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Sundown Bankshares, Inc.
Sundown State Bank - Brownfield Branch
Sundown State Bank - Denver City Branch
Sundown State Bank - Levelland Branch
Sundown State Bank - Sundown State Bank
Sundown State Bank - Wall Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Sundown State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Sundown State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sundown State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21731