Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
58211
2006
FDIC Certificate Number: 58211
FDIC's unique number: 442273
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3433056
Report Date: 2010-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-08-25
2006-06-21 Institution established. Original name: Sunrise Bank Of Atlanta.
2010-07-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sunrise Bank in Valdosta, Georgia.
Total assets: $52,831,000
Total deposits: $47,803,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Sunrise Bank of Atlanta does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Sunrise Bank of Atlanta, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sunrise Bank of Atlanta will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6866