Sunrise Bank Of San Diego

California – San Diego – San Diego

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

57067

2001

FDIC Certificate Number: 57067
FDIC's unique number: 356772
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Orange

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2942814
Report Date: 2009-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-03-15

2001-01-11 Institution established. Original name: Sunrise Bank Of San Diego.
2009-09-01 Changed name to Sunrise Bank Of San Diego .
2010-03-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sunrise Bank in San Diego, California.
2011-07-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of AmericanWest Bank in Spokane, Washington.

Total assets: $83,825,000
Total deposits: $66,136,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Sunrise Bank Of San Diego does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Sunrise Bank Of San Diego, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sunrise Bank Of San Diego will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22626

  Search
All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.