Texas – Nacogdoches – Nacogdoches
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Texas
Nacogdoches
Nacogdoches
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
33165
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33165
FDIC's unique number: 46402
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 696373
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-02
1990-08-10 Institution established. Original name: Superior Savings Bank, F.S.B.
1990-08-10 Acquired Superior Federal Savings Bank in Nacogdoches, Texas.
1991-07-19 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Commercial National Bank in Nacogdoches in Nacogdoches, Texas.
1995-10-01 Changed name to Commercial Bank Of Texas, National Association .
1998-01-30 Acquired The Bank Of East Texas, S.S.B. in Lufkin, Texas.
Total assets: $49,972,000
Total deposits: $57,868,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Superior Savings Bank, F.S.B. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Superior Savings Bank, F.S.B., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Superior Savings Bank, F.S.B. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19869