Georgia – Talbot – Woodland
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.talbotstatebank.com
Georgia
Talbot
Woodland
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
178
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 178
FDIC's unique number: 141
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 577230
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-02-14
1907-11-25 Institution established. Original name: The Woodland Bank.
1981-05-01 Changed name to Talbot State Bank .
2004-08-19 Moved bank headquarters from Woodland, Georgia to Fayetteville, Georgia.
2009-10-12 Moved bank headquarters from Fayetteville, Georgia to Woodland, Georgia.
Total assets: $71,385,000
Total deposits: $66,006,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $66,006,000
Equity capital: $5,287,000
Net income: $-230,000
Return on Assets: -0.64
Return on Equity: -9.28
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Tsb Bancorp, Inc.
Talbot State Bank - Fayetteville Branch
Talbot State Bank - Talbot State Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Talbot State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Talbot State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Talbot State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6967