Texas – Brown – Brownwood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.texasbank.com
Texas
Brown
Brownwood
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
19559
1966
FDIC Certificate Number: 19559
FDIC's unique number: 13359
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 232856
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 9
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-12-18
1966-03-07 Institution established. Original name: The Southwest State Bank.
1984-03-01 Changed name to Interfirst Bank Brownwood .
1987-11-30 Acquired Texas Bank in Brownwood, Texas.
1987-11-30 Changed name to Texas Bank .
1992-01-23 Acquired First State Bank in Bangs, Texas.
Total assets: $287,222,000
Total deposits: $247,111,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $247,111,000
Equity capital: $37,537,000
Net income: $4,484,000
Return on Assets: 3.08
Return on Equity: 25.51
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Texas Bank - Bangs Banking Branch
Texas Bank - Brownwood Branch
Texas Bank - Brownwood Marketplace Banking Center
Texas Bank - Comanche Banking Center Branch
Texas Bank - Detached Facility
No associations
LandOfFree
Texas Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Texas Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Texas Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23864