Texas – Nueces – Corpus Christi
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Nueces
Corpus Christi
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
19292
1964
FDIC Certificate Number: 19292
FDIC's unique number: 13105
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 769259
Report Date: 1987-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15431
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1964-11-23 Institution established. Original name: Gulfway National Bank Of Corpus Christi.
1981-06-16 Changed name to Texas Commerce Bank - Gulfway, National Association .
1987-06-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Texas Commerce Bank - Corpus Christi, National Association in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1994-04-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Frost National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.
1995-05-19 Acquired National Commerce Bank in Houston, Texas.
1995-06-23 Acquired The Valley National Bank in Mcallen, Texas.
1996-03-22 Acquired State Bank And Trust Company in San Marcos, Texas.
1996-06-07 Acquired Park National Bank Of Houston in Houston, Texas.
1997-03-07 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Corpus Christi in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1998-01-02 Acquired Harrisburg Bank, Houston, Texas in Houston, Texas.
1998-05-29 Acquired Overton Bank And Trust, National Association in Fort Worth, Texas.
1999-01-14 Acquired Keller State Bank in Keller, Texas.
1999-05-20 Acquired Bank Of Commerce in Fort Worth, Texas.
2000-05-26 Acquired United States National Bank Of Galveston in Galveston, Texas.
2005-10-07 Acquired Horizon Capital Bank in Houston, Texas.
2006-02-09 Acquired Texas Community Bank And Trust, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
2006-06-23 Acquired Alamo Bank Of Texas in Alamo, Texas.
2006-12-08 Acquired Summit Bank, National Association in Fort Worth, Texas.
Total assets: $59,041,000
Total deposits: $55,225,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Texas Commerce Bank - Gulfway, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Texas Commerce Bank - Gulfway, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Texas Commerce Bank - Gulfway, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26230