Texas – Dallas – Dallas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Dallas
Dallas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
18046
1959
FDIC Certificate Number: 18046
FDIC's unique number: 11971
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 439860
Report Date: 2009-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-15
1959-07-16 Institution established. Original name: Gulf Coast State Bank.
1977-12-31 Changed name to Allied Gulf Coast Bank .
1984-10-01 Changed name to Gulf Coast Bank .
2006-04-01 Changed name to Texas First Bank .
2006-11-07 Changed name to Texas First Bank - Winnie .
2009-09-24 Moved bank headquarters from Winnie, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
2009-09-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-04-16 Acquired Tamalpais Bank in San Rafael, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-30 Acquired Frontier Bank in Everett, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $105,857,000
Total deposits: $89,545,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Texas First Bank - Winnie does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Texas First Bank - Winnie, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Texas First Bank - Winnie will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24112