Connecticut – New Haven – Cheshire
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Connecticut
New Haven
Cheshire
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
57138
2001
FDIC Certificate Number: 57138
FDIC's unique number: 358490
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2996536
Report Date: 2009-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-06-12
2001-03-02 Institution established. Original name: The Apple Valley Bank & Trust Company.
2009-06-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NEW ENGLAND BANK in Enfield, Connecticut.
Total assets: $84,568,000
Total deposits: $74,501,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Apple Valley Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Apple Valley Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Apple Valley Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12622