Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.thebancorp.com
Delaware
New Castle
Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
35444
2000
FDIC Certificate Number: 35444
FDIC's unique number: 80043
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2858960
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-11-18
2000-07-28 Institution established. Original name: The Bancorp.com Bank.
2002-09-06 Changed name to The Bancorp Bank .
Total assets: $2,460,946,000
Total deposits: $2,236,441,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $2,236,441,000
Equity capital: $197,037,000
Net income: $3,726,000
Return on Assets: 0.29
Return on Equity: 3.87
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Bancorp, Inc., The
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bancorp Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bancorp Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bancorp Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5218