Texas
Sutton
Sonora
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
24299
1983
FDIC Certificate Number: 24299
FDIC's unique number: 16901
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock
Federal Reserve ID Number: 263467
Report Date: 1998-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1999-04-28
1983-01-03 Institution established. Original name: Sutton County National Bank.
1998-11-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1998-11-13 Changed name to The Bank And Trust, S.S.B. .
1998-11-13 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1999-01-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Bank and Trust, s.s.b. in Del Rio, Texas.
2002-12-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2006-03-31 Changed name to The Bank And Trust, S.S.B. .
Total assets: $27,570,000
Total deposits: $24,703,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bank and Trust, S.S.B. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bank and Trust, S.S.B., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank and Trust, S.S.B. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17363