Kansas – Jefferson – Mc Louth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Jefferson
Mc Louth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
15363
1887
FDIC Certificate Number: 15363
FDIC's unique number: 9690
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 143158
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-09-21
1887-10-17 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Mclouth.
2004-08-02 Moved bank headquarters from Mclouth, Kansas to Mc Louth, Kansas.
2011-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Union State Bank of Everest in Everest, Kansas.
Total assets: $37,740,000
Total deposits: $34,065,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $34,065,000
Equity capital: $3,612,000
Net income: $245,000
Return on Assets: 1.26
Return on Equity: 14.57
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Everest Bancshares, Inc.
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bank of McLouth does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bank of McLouth, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank of McLouth will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-884