Texas – Medina – Devine
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.tbotdevine.com
Texas
Medina
Devine
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
26905
1987
FDIC Certificate Number: 26905
FDIC's unique number: 36248
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 640152
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1987-02-23 Institution established. Original name: Devine State Bank.
1993-03-08 Changed name to The Bank Of Texas .
1999-02-24 Reorganized.
Total assets: $51,186,000
Total deposits: $44,424,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $44,424,000
Equity capital: $4,492,000
Net income: $-353,000
Return on Assets: -1.39
Return on Equity: -15.22
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Bank Of Texas Bancshares, Inc., The
The Bank Of Texas - San Antonio Branch
The Bank Of Texas - The Bank Of Texas
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bank of Texas does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bank of Texas, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank of Texas will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11883