Kansas – Ness – Bazine
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Ness
Bazine
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
15869
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 15869
FDIC's unique number: 10106
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 999252
Report Date: 1989-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Bazine State Bank.
1990-04-12 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Farmers Bank & Trust, National Association in Great Bend, Kansas.
2008-02-28 Acquired Progress Bank Of Missouri in Sullivan, Missouri.
2010-09-10 Acquired First National Bank & Trust Company In Larned in Larned, Kansas.
2011-07-21 Reorganized.
Total assets: $16,940,000
Total deposits: $16,509,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bazine State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bazine State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bazine State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17257