New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Manchester
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Hillsborough
Manchester
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
20870
1972
FDIC Certificate Number: 20870
FDIC's unique number: 14419
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 26608
Report Date: 1989-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1972-11-27 Institution established. Original name: The Bedford Bank.
1983-07-02 Acquired Londonderry Bank And Trust Company in Londonderry, New Hampshire.
1989-04-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1990-02-28 Acquired First Cheshire Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
1992-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $107,590,000
Total deposits: $91,910,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bedford Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bedford Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bedford Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17697