Wisconsin – Dane – Black Earth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Wisconsin
Dane
Black Earth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12787
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 12787
FDIC's unique number: 8100
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Madison
Federal Reserve ID Number: 33549
Report Date: 2010-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-05-21
1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Black Earth State Bank.
2010-05-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of State Bank of Cross Plains in Cross Plains, Wisconsin.
Total assets: $44,357,000
Total deposits: $40,976,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Black Earth State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Black Earth State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Black Earth State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24923