Vermont – Orange – Bradford
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Vermont
Orange
Bradford
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6262
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 6262
FDIC's unique number: 4229
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 258502
Report Date: 1992-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 7267
The date of the last data update: 1992-08-20
1904-05-04 Institution established. Original name: The Bradford National Bank.
1992-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Vermont in Bradford, Vermont.
1993-01-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New First National Bank of Vermont, National Association in Bradford, Vermont.
1993-06-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Merchants Bank in Burlington, Vermont.
1996-05-24 Moved bank headquarters from Bradford, Vermont to Burlington, Vermont.
Total assets: $95,007,000
Total deposits: $94,308,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Bradford National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Bradford National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bradford National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17968