www.rightreasons.com
Vermont
Windham
Brattleboro
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
28837
1912
FDIC Certificate Number: 28837
FDIC's unique number: 41671
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 580874
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-10-21
1912-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Battleboro Savings And Loan Association.
1985-02-28 Changed name to Brattleboro Savings And Loan Association .
1989-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Brattleboro Town, Vermont to Brattleboro, Vermont.
1994-11-01 Acquired Springfield Savings And Loan Association in Springfield, Vermont.
1994-11-01 Changed name to The Brattleboro Savings And Loan Association, F.A. .
2009-07-30 Changed name to The Brattleboro Savings And Loan Association .
2009-07-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2009-07-30 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
2009-07-30 Changed institution class to Fdic Supervised Savings Bank.
Total assets: $186,590,000
Total deposits: $153,975,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $153,975,000
Equity capital: $13,720,000
Net income: $134,000
Return on Assets: 0.14
Return on Equity: 1.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
The Brattleboro Savings And Loan Association - Springfield Branc
The Brattleboro Savings And Loan Association - The Brattleboro S
The Brattleboro Savings And Loan Association - West Chesterfield
No associations
LandOfFree
The Brattleboro Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Brattleboro Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Brattleboro Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26957