Kansas – Montgomery – Caney
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kansas
Montgomery
Caney
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4633
1886
FDIC Certificate Number: 4633
FDIC's unique number: 3073
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wichita
Federal Reserve ID Number: 670551
Report Date: 2006-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 5349
The date of the last data update: 2007-02-16
1886-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Caney Valley National Bank.
2007-01-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Arvest Bank in Fayetteville, Arkansas.
2009-12-11 Acquired Solutionsbank in Overland Park, Kansas as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $40,951,000
Total deposits: $36,537,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Caney Valley National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Caney Valley National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Caney Valley National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24417