Missouri – Cole – Jefferson City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.centralbank.net
Missouri
Cole
Jefferson City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
12633
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 12633
FDIC's unique number: 8021
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 853952
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 13
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1902-02-03 Institution established. Original name: The Central Trust Bank.
1985-12-13 Acquired The Central Lake State Bank in Lake Ozark, Missouri.
1999-04-12 Acquired The Farmers And Traders Bank in California, Missouri.
1999-12-16 Acquired Fulton Savings Bank, Fsb in Fulton, Missouri.
Total assets: $2,306,257,000
Total deposits: $1,554,134,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,554,134,000
Equity capital: $172,214,000
Net income: $13,939,000
Return on Assets: 1.34
Return on Equity: 16.87
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Central Bancompany
The Central Trust Bank - Central Bank West Branch
The Central Trust Bank - Central Motor Branch
The Central Trust Bank - Fulton Branch
The Central Trust Bank - Fulton North Branch
The Central Trust Bank - Holts Summit Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
The Central Trust Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Central Trust Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Central Trust Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9662