Rhode Island – Kent – West Warwick
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Rhode Island
Kent
West Warwick
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
2077
1828
FDIC Certificate Number: 2077
FDIC's unique number: 1375
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 690102
Report Date: 1993-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1284
The date of the last data update: 1994-01-25
1828-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Centreville National Bank Of Warwick.
1993-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Centreville Savings Bank in West Warwick, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $43,145,000
Total deposits: $36,447,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Centreville National Bank of Warwick does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Centreville National Bank of Warwick, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Centreville National Bank of Warwick will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22396