Texas – Nacogdoches – Chireno
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Nacogdoches
Chireno
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8441
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 8441
FDIC's unique number: 5373
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 883155
Report Date: 1991-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-05-22
1911-10-18 Institution established. Original name: The Chireno State Bank.
1991-05-09 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First Service Bank in Gladewater, Texas.
1993-03-16 Acquired Mineola State Bank in Mineola, Texas.
1995-01-01 Acquired Lindale National Bank in Lindale, Texas.
1995-08-14 Changed name to First Service Bank .
1996-12-14 Acquired First Heritage Bank, National Association in Pittsburg, Texas.
1997-04-18 Moved bank headquarters from Gladewater, Texas to Marshall, Texas.
1999-03-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hibernia National Bank in New Orleans, Louisiana.
1999-05-21 Acquired Beaumont Trust Company, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
2004-05-13 Acquired Coastal Banc, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2006-04-24 Changed name to Capital One, National Association .
2007-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from New Orleans, Louisiana to Mclean, Virginia.
2007-07-01 Acquired Capital One, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-08-01 Acquired North Fork Bank in Mattituck, New York.
2008-03-08 Acquired Superior Savings Of New England, National Association in Branford, Connecticut.
2009-07-30 Acquired Chevy Chase Bank, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2011-04-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $12,397,000
Total deposits: $12,345,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Chireno State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Chireno State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Chireno State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19080