Georgia – Troup – Hogansville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Troup
Hogansville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
18486
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 18486
FDIC's unique number: 12381
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 629634
Report Date: 1999-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-05-08
1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens Bank.
2000-02-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Flag Bank in La Grange, Georgia.
2000-12-30 Acquired Thomaston Federal Savings Bank in Thomaston, Georgia.
2000-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FLAG Bank in Vienna, Georgia.
2002-12-30 Moved bank headquarters from La Grange, Georgia to Atlanta, Georgia.
2005-12-02 Acquired First Capital Bank in Norcross, Georgia.
2006-12-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBC Centura Bank in Raleigh, North Carolina.
2008-04-05 Changed name to Rbc Bank .
2008-04-12 Acquired Indian River National Bank in Vero Beach, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Georgia State Bank in Mableton, Georgia.
2008-04-12 Acquired The Peachtree Bank in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-04-12 Acquired Millennium Bank in Gainesville, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Florida Choice Bank in Mount Dora, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Community Bank Of Naples, National Association in Naples, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Cypress Coquina Bank in Ormond Beach, Florida.
2008-06-21 Acquired Alabama Exchange Bank in Tuskegee, Alabama.
2008-06-21 Acquired First American Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
Total assets: $29,720,000
Total deposits: $25,930,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Citizens Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Citizens Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Citizens Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15214