Kentucky – Grayson – Leitchfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Grayson
Leitchfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8115
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 8115
FDIC's unique number: 5165
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 771841
Report Date: 2001-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2001-08-06
1907-02-02 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens Bank And Trust Company Of Grayson County.
2001-07-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wilson & Muir Bank & Trust Company in Bardstown, Kentucky.
Total assets: $76,192,000
Total deposits: $64,322,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Citizens Bank and Trust Company of Grayson County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Citizens Bank and Trust Company of Grayson County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Citizens Bank and Trust Company of Grayson County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22590