Ohio – Brown – Hamersville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Ohio
Brown
Hamersville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
9134
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 9134
FDIC's unique number: 5848
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus
Federal Reserve ID Number: 422817
Report Date: 1973-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1906-09-06 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens Bank Company.
1974-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The People's National Bank of Georgetown in Georgetown, Ohio.
1982-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The National Bank and Trust Company in Wilmington, Ohio.
1992-09-01 Acquired Kentucky National Bank Of Ohio in Georgetown, Ohio.
1993-12-29 Acquired Williamsburg Building And Loan Company in Williamsburg, Ohio.
2001-12-10 Acquired The Sabina Bank in Sabina, Ohio.
2009-12-31 Acquired The Community National Bank in Franklin, Ohio.
2010-03-19 Acquired American National Bank in Parma, Ohio as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $2,235,000
Total deposits: $1,979,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Citizens Bank Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Citizens Bank Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Citizens Bank Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20598