Connecticut
Middlesex
Middletown
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
18210
1903
FDIC Certificate Number: 18210
FDIC's unique number: 12130
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 340603
Report Date: 1983-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1903-08-17 Institution established. Original name: The City Savings Bank Of Middletown.
1983-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Farmers and Mechanics Savings Bank in Middletown, Connecticut.
1985-05-21 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1989-06-30 Changed name to Farmers And Mechanics Bank .
1996-11-07 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1996-11-07 Changed name to Citizens Bank Of Connecticut .
1996-11-07 Reorganized.
1997-03-06 Moved bank headquarters from Middletown, Connecticut to New London, Connecticut.
1997-08-28 Acquired The Bank Of New Haven in New Haven, Connecticut.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The City Savings Bank of Middletown does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The City Savings Bank of Middletown, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The City Savings Bank of Middletown will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9191