Massachusetts – Dukes – Edgartown
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.edgartownnationalbank.com
Massachusetts
Dukes
Edgartown
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
2575
1905
FDIC Certificate Number: 2575
FDIC's unique number: 1669
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 767705
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 7957
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1905-09-02 Institution established. Original name: The Edgartown National Bank.
2000-06-30 Reorganized.
Total assets: $130,772,000
Total deposits: $108,083,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $108,083,000
Equity capital: $11,884,000
Net income: $418,000
Return on Assets: 0.64
Return on Equity: 6.87
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Island Bancorp, Inc.
The Edgartown National Bank - Oak Bluffs Branch
The Edgartown National Bank - The Edgartown National Bank
The Edgartown National Bank - Upper Main Street Branch
The Edgartown National Bank - Vineyard Haven Ii Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
The Edgartown National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Edgartown National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Edgartown National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7800