New Hampshire – Rockingham – Exeter
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Exeter
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17763
1893
FDIC Certificate Number: 17763
FDIC's unique number: 11717
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 427401
Report Date: 1990-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-02-11
1893-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Exeter Banking Company.
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $263,527,000
Total deposits: $230,938,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Exeter Banking Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Exeter Banking Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Exeter Banking Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6553