Kansas – Graham – Hill City
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Kansas
Graham
Hill City
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
15862
1886
FDIC Certificate Number: 15862
FDIC's unique number: 10099
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 681959
Report Date: 1987-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1995-10-02
1886-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers And Merchants Bank Of Hill City.
1988-02-18 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City in Hill City, Kansas.
Total assets: $16,496,000
Total deposits: $16,611,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17265