Kansas – Clay – Wakefield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Clay
Wakefield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
1871
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 1871
FDIC's unique number: 1247
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 70254
Report Date: 2010-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-07-02
1908-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers And Merchants State Bank.
2010-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Riley State Bank of Riley, Kansas in Riley, Kansas.
Total assets: $22,239,000
Total deposits: $17,067,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Farmers and Merchants State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Farmers and Merchants State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers and Merchants State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9401