Texas – Runnels – Ballinger
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Runnels
Ballinger
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
11893
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 11893
FDIC's unique number: 7596
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 198354
Report Date: 1988-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers & Merchants State Bank.
1989-03-16 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Rotan in Rotan, Texas.
1997-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Rotan, Texas.
Total assets: $22,534,000
Total deposits: $22,005,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Farmers & Merchants State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Farmers & Merchants State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers & Merchants State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20421