Alabama – Lee – Opelika
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Alabama
Lee
Opelika
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
2820
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 2820
FDIC's unique number: 1842
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Montgomery
Federal Reserve ID Number: 495530
Report Date: 2001-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 9550
The date of the last data update: 2002-01-25
1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers National Bank Of Opelika.
1985-02-01 Reorganized.
2001-12-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American Bank in Decatur, Alabama.
2004-12-10 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2004-12-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2005-02-19 Moved bank headquarters from Decatur, Alabama to Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-02-19 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce Of Birmingham in Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-05-21 Acquired First Citizens Bank in Talladega, Alabama.
2005-11-01 Reorganized.
2007-09-22 Acquired Bank Of Dadeville in Dadeville, Alabama.
2008-06-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBC Bank in Raleigh, North Carolina.
2008-12-03 Moved bank headquarters from Birmingham, Alabama to Raleigh, North Carolina.
Total assets: $194,828,000
Total deposits: $173,747,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Farmers National Bank of Opelika does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Farmers National Bank of Opelika, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers National Bank of Opelika will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7844