Oklahoma – Pittsburg – Quinton
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.farmersstatebankonline.com
Oklahoma
Pittsburg
Quinton
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
404
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 404
FDIC's unique number: 310
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 647759
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1908-03-08 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers State Bank.
1983-12-16 Acquired The Bank Of Red Oak in Red Oak, Oklahoma.
1999-07-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $79,644,000
Total deposits: $69,749,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $69,749,000
Equity capital: $6,188,000
Net income: $421,000
Return on Assets: 1.1
Return on Equity: 14.8
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: F.S.b. Properties, Inc.
The Farmers State Bank - Haskell County Branch
The Farmers State Bank - Red Oak Branch
The Farmers State Bank - The Farmers State Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
The Farmers State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Farmers State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5187