Kansas – Graham – Bogue
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Graham
Bogue
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
15223
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 15223
FDIC's unique number: 9577
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 6655
Report Date: 1988-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1909-10-09 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers State Bank, Bogue, Kansas.
1989-03-16 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Farmers and Merchants Bank of Hill City in Hill City, Kansas.
1997-12-19 Moved bank headquarters from Bogue, Kansas to Hill City, Kansas.
Total assets: $8,044,000
Total deposits: $7,962,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Farmers State Bank, Bogue, Kansas does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Farmers State Bank, Bogue, Kansas, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Farmers State Bank, Bogue, Kansas will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19946