New Hampshire – Coos – Colebrook
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.firstcolebrookbank.com
New Hampshire
Coos
Colebrook
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
6212
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 6212
FDIC's unique number: 4189
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 58207
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-12-13
1889-11-01 Institution established. Original name: The First Colebrook Bank.
1975-01-02 Acquired Colebrook Guaranty Savings Bank in Colebrook, New Hampshire.
1985-07-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $225,890,000
Total deposits: $195,321,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $195,321,000
Equity capital: $18,536,000
Net income: $497,000
Return on Assets: 0.44
Return on Equity: 5.43
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: First Colebrook Bancorp, Inc.
The First Colebrook Bank - Amherst Branch
The First Colebrook Bank - Concord Branch
The First Colebrook Bank - Portsmouth Branch
The First Colebrook Bank - The First Colebrook Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
The First Colebrook Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First Colebrook Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First Colebrook Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13882