Kansas – Stafford – Saint John
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.fnbsj.com
Kansas
Stafford
Saint John
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4765
1885
FDIC Certificate Number: 4765
FDIC's unique number: 3179
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 535351
Report Date: 2004-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 3467
The date of the last data update: 2004-07-16
1885-04-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Saint John.
1975-03-01 Changed name to The First National Bank And Trust .
2004-07-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of American State Bank & Trust Company, National Association in Great Bend, Kansas.
2008-07-01 Changed name to American State Bank & Trust Company .
2008-07-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2008-07-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $47,391,000
Total deposits: $37,019,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-619