Oklahoma – Alfalfa – Carmen
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Oklahoma
Alfalfa
Carmen
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4053
1924
FDIC Certificate Number: 4053
FDIC's unique number: 2628
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 325851
Report Date: 1989-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 12498
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1924-02-24 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank In Carmen.
1989-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Cleo State Bank in Cleo Springs, Oklahoma.
1990-04-19 Moved bank headquarters from Carmen, Oklahoma to Cleo Springs, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $5,526,000
Total deposits: $5,001,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank in Carmen does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank in Carmen, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank in Carmen will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18309